Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 01/14/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/14/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/14/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/14/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/04/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/04/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/20/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/31/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/31/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/31/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/07/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/20/2004