There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Care for the Uninsured Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow individuals a refundable credit against income tax for the purchase of private health insurance, and to establish State health insurance safety-net programs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/01/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
08/01/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S10920-10923)
Action By: Senate
08/01/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10919-10920)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 08/01/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/05/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/15/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/27/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 10/29/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/12/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance08/01/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1570. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/01/2003)

Fair Care for the Uninsured Act of 2003 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow an individual a tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid for qualified health insurance, subject to stated limitations. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to make payments to the provider of an individual's qualified health insurance equal to such individual's qualified health insurance credit advance amount with respect to such provider.

Amends the Public Health Service Act, as inserted by the Trade Act of 2002, to extend funding for State high risk health insurance pools.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to allow health benefits coverage through individual membership associations. Sets forth association requirements. Requires associations to include a minimum of two health insurance coverage options.