There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to redesignate the facility of the United States Postal Service, located at 315 Empire Boulevard in Crown Heights, Brooklyn, New York, as the "James E. Davis Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2003Became Public Law No: 108-141. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2003Signed by President.
11/19/2003Presented to President.
11/17/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11171-11172)
10/29/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13531-13532; text as passed Senate: CR S13531)
10/27/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
09/08/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/01/2003Became Public Law No: 108-141. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2003Signed by President.
11/19/2003SenatePresented to President.
11/17/2003-3:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2003-3:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11171-11172)
11/17/2003-2:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1590.
11/17/2003-2:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11171-11172)
11/17/2003-2:55pmHouseMr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/06/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
11/06/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
10/30/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
10/30/2003-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
10/30/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/29/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13531-13532; text as passed Senate: CR S13531)
10/27/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 330.
10/27/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
10/22/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/08/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/08/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs09/08/2003 Referred to
10/22/2003 Markup by
10/27/2003 Reported by
House Government Reform10/30/2003 Referred to
11/06/2003 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1590. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-141 (12/01/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. Postal Service facility located at 315 Empire Boulevard in Crown Heights, Brooklyn, New York, as the James E. Davis Post Office Building.