Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/02/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/21/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/22/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/27/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/27/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/30/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/03/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/25/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/22/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/02/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/02/2004