Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 09/11/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/03/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/15/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/16/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/17/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/20/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/20/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/21/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/22/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/31/2003