Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/16/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/22/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/04/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/13/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/20/2003