Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/23/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/23/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/23/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/02/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/02/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/02/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/02/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/14/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/14/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/14/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/16/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/21/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/21/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/21/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/28/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/28/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/28/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/28/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/28/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 10/28/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/28/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/03/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/06/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/06/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/10/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/10/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/10/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/14/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/18/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/25/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 11/25/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/09/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/20/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/04/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/10/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/11/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/23/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/29/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/07/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/08/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/26/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/26/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/03/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/04/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/12/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew