Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/26/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/21/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/23/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/26/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/10/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/10/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/11/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/17/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/17/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/01/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/01/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/01/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/03/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/14/2004