Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/30/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/30/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/01/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/01/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/14/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/22/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/13/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/14/2003