Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/01/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/01/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/14/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/14/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/17/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/27/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/04/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/12/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/12/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/12/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 11/12/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/19/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/21/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/21/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/28/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/23/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/29/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/20/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/08/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/21/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/29/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/09/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/09/2004