Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/15/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/14/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/24/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/12/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/31/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/08/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/19/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/13/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/07/2004