Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/02/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/15/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/18/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/25/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 01/20/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/02/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/27/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/26/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/06/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/07/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/06/2004