Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 01/21/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/22/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/02/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/08/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/17/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/19/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/21/2004