Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/15/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/17/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/17/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/27/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/27/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/30/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 11/12/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/09/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/27/2004