Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/16/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/17/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/17/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/17/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/21/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/22/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/22/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/22/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/22/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/22/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/24/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/14/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/24/2003