There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

American Home Fire Safety Act

Short Titles as Introduced

American Home Fire Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for comprehensive fire safety standards for upholstered furniture, mattresses, bedclothing, and candles.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/10/2004Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/11/04 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/30/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
11/10/2004Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 798.
Action By: Senate
11/10/2004Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain under authority of the order of the Senate of 10/11/04 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
09/22/2004Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
07/14/2004Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 108-964.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
10/30/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR 10/31/2003 S13662)
Action By: Senate
10/30/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR 10/31/2003 S13661-13662)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/30/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/04/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/04/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/30/2003 Referred to
07/14/2004 Hearings by
09/22/2004 Markup by
11/10/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1798. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/10/2004)

American Home Fire Safety Act - Requires the Consumer Product Safety Commission to evaluate and report to Congress on: (1) the interaction of bedclothing with the mattress in a fire and methodologies to improve the fire resistance of these products; (2) the current risk candles create as an ignition source in the home and the effectiveness of and level of compliance with the ASTM International Standard Specification for Fire Safety for Candles.

Requires the Commission, if it has not promulgated a rule to improve the fire retardancy of upholstered furniture by June 1, 2005, to transmit a report to Congress explaining why such rule was not issued.

Requires the Commission, if it has not issued an advance notice of proposed rulemaking regarding fire safe mattresses by June 1, 2005, to: (1) initiate a study to evaluate methodologies to improve fire resistance of such mattresses by June 30, 2005; (2) perform a comparative cost-benefit analysis of a mattress standard that would mandate 30-, 45-, and 60-minute flashover prevention; and (3) report its findings and recommendations to Congress.

Directs the Commission to create a registry of fire-retardant chemicals by June 1, 2005. Requires the registry to include: (1) a list of manufacturers producing fire-retardant chemicals for sale or use in or on Commission-regulated products sold or used in the United States; (2) a list of such chemicals for each manufacturer; (3) a ranking of sales of such chemicals by each manufacturer measured by volume of chemicals sold; and (4) a list of studies and reports on the human impact of such chemicals performed by those manufacturers.

Requires the Commission to submit an annual report to Congress on the results of the registry.

Authorizes appropriations.