Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/03/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/03/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 11/03/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/04/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/05/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/10/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/10/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/18/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/21/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/28/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 01/28/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/02/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/02/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/02/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/09/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/09/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/10/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/12/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/08/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/19/2004