Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 11/07/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/10/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/25/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 02/24/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/19/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/04/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/12/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/21/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/16/2004