Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/24/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/25/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/25/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/08/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/01/2004