There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Mammography Quality Standards Reauthorization Act of 2004

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Mammography Quality Standards Reauthorization Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Mammography Quality Standards Reauthorization Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to revise and extend provisions relating to mammography quality standards.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/02/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S379; text as passed Senate: CR S379)
12/09/2003Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Gregg without amendment. With written report No. 108-220.
11/18/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
02/24/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/03/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/03/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/03/2004-12:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/02/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S379; text as passed Senate: CR S379)
12/09/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 424.
12/09/2003SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Gregg without amendment. With written report No. 108-220.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
11/21/2003SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
11/18/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
11/18/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S15062-15064)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/18/2003 Referred to
11/21/2003 Markup by
12/09/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-220
House Energy and Commerce02/03/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/24/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1879. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/02/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here, with an updated title.)

Mammography Quality Standards Reauthorization Act of 2004 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to issue a temporary renewal certificate (45-day maximum) to a mammography facility seeking reaccreditation if the accreditation body has issued an accreditation extension based upon the fact that the facility has: (1) submitted the required materials but the accreditation body was unable to complete the reaccreditation process before certification expiration; or (2) acquired additional or replacement equipment, or has had significant personnel changes or other unforeseen situations that have caused it to be unable to meet reaccreditation time frames, but in the opinion of the accreditation body has not compromised mammography quality.

Authorizes the Secretary, upon the request of an accreditation body, to issue a limited provisional certificate to an entity to enable it to conduct examinations for educational purposes while an onsite visit from an accreditation body is in progress (72-hour maximum).

Authorizes appropriations for the mammography facilities certification program through FY 2005.