Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 11/18/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 01/27/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/03/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/09/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/15/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/21/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/21/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/20/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/30/2004