Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/13/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/24/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/06/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/13/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/18/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/14/2003