Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/21/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/24/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/09/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/09/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 12/09/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/10/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/23/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/01/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/01/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/18/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/07/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/21/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/23/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/16/2004