Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 11/24/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/22/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/27/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/24/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/11/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/30/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/06/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/20/2004