Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/21/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/21/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 01/27/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/09/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/08/2004