Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/23/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/09/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/09/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/09/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/20/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/07/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/20/2004