Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 01/22/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/23/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/05/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/05/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/19/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/19/2004