There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Oglala Sioux Tribe Angostura Irrigation Project Modernization and Development Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Oglala Sioux Tribe Angostura Irrigation Project Modernization and Development Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Oglala Sioux Tribe Angostura Irrigation Project Rehabilitation and Development Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance and provide to the Oglala Sioux Tribe and Angostura Irrigation Project certain benefits of the Pick-Sloan Missouri River basin program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/19/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11566-11584; text as passed Senate: CR S11578-11579; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S11577-11578)
07/20/2004Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-311.
12/09/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
11/30/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/20/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
11/20/2004-11:24amHouseReceived in the House.
11/20/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/2004SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11566-11584; text as passed Senate: CR S11578-11579; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S11577-11578)
07/20/2004SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 654.
07/20/2004SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-311.
06/23/2004SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/16/2004SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 108-625.
12/09/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S16134-16135)
12/09/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S16134)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/12/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/29/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs12/09/2003 Referred to
06/16/2004 Hearings by
06/23/2004 Markup by
07/20/2004 Reported by S. Rept. 108-311
House Resources11/20/2004 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power11/30/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1996.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/19/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 20, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Oglala Sioux Tribe Angostura Irrigation Project Modernization and Development Act - Title I: Modernization - Requires the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) carry out the modernization and improvement of irrigation facilities at the Angostura Unit as described in a specified report; and (2) provide for the delivery of water saved through such modernization and improvement for fish and wildlife purposes and environmental restoration on the Pine Ridge Indian Reservation, South Dakota.

Title II: Development - (Sec. 201) Establishes the Oglala Sioux Tribal Development Trust Fund in the Treasury. Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to make specified deposits into the Fund and payments from it to the Tribe beginning in the 11th fiscal year after enactment of this Act.

Requires the governing body of the Tribe to prepare a development plan that provides for the manner in which the Tribe shall expend such payments to promote: (1) economic development; (2) infrastructure development; (3) the educational, health, recreational, and social welfare objectives of the Tribe and its members; or (4) any combination of these activities.

Requires the Tribal Council to make a copy of the plan available for review and comment by members of the Tribe before it becomes final.

Authorizes the Tribal Council to revise and update the plan on an annual basis, subject to review and comment procedures.

States that activities of the Tribe in carrying out the plan shall be audited as part of the annual single-agency audit that the Tribe is required to prepare pursuant to a specified Office of Management and Budget circular.

Requires a copy of the audit findings to be inserted into the Tribal Council's published minutes of proceedings.

Prohibits distribution of any portion of any payment to the Tribe to any member on a per capita basis.

(Sec. 202) States that no payment made to the Tribe shall result in the reduction or denial of any service or program under Federal law with respect to which: (1) the Tribe is otherwise entitled because of its status as a federally recognized Indian tribe; or (2) any individual is entitled because of his or her status as a member of the Tribe.

(Sec. 204) States that nothing in this Act: (1) affects any rights, benefits, privileges or claims (including water rights or claims to water rights) of the Tribe, whether located on or off the Reservation, based on treaty, Executive order, agreement, Act of Congress, aboriginal title, the Winters doctrine, or otherwise; (2) validates or invalidates any assertion of the existence, nonexistence, or extinguishment of any water rights or claims to such rights held by the Tribe or any other Indian tribe or individual Indian under Federal or State law; or (3) affects any other water rights in existence on the date of enactment of this Act.