Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 12/09/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/20/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/21/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/10/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/23/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/23/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/07/2004