Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/20/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/22/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/26/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/06/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/05/2004