Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/21/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 01/21/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/03/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/03/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/04/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/08/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/08/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/15/2004