Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/09/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/01/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/21/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/21/2004