Text: S.2057 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-220 (04/22/2004)

 
[108th Congress Public Law 220]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ220.108]

[[Page 118 STAT. 618]]

Public Law 108-220
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To require the Secretary of Defense to reimburse members of the United 
States Armed Forces for certain transportation expenses incurred by the 
  members in connection with leave under the Central Command Rest and 
 Recuperation Leave Program before the program was expanded to include 
         domestic travel. <<NOTE: Apr. 22, 2004 -  [S. 2057]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. REIMBURSEMENT OF CERTAIN TRANSPORTATION COSTS INCURRED 
                              BY MEMBERS OF THE UNITED STATES 
                              ARMED FORCES ON REST AND 
                              RECUPERATION LEAVE.

    The Secretary of Defense shall reimburse a member of the United 
States Armed Forces for transportation expenses incurred by such member 
for one round trip by such member between two locations within the 
United States in connection with leave taken under the Central Command 
Rest and Recuperation Leave Program during the period beginning on 
September 25, 2003, and ending on December 18, 2003.

    Approved April 22, 2004.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2057:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 150 (2004):
            Mar. 3, considered and passed Senate.
            Mar. 30, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>