Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/10/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/10/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/22/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/22/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/22/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/23/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/25/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/01/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/05/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/13/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/21/2004