Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/11/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/24/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/03/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/03/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/25/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/25/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/29/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/19/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/19/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/04/2004