There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Galisteo Basin Archaeological Sites Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Galisteo Basin Archaeological Sites Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the protection of archaeological sites in the Galisteo Basin in New Mexico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/04/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3104-3105; text as passed Senate: CR S3104-3105)
02/11/2003Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 108-7.
01/23/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
03/10/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/05/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
03/05/2003-10:01amHouseReceived in the House.
03/05/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/04/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3104-3105; text as passed Senate: CR S3104-3105)
02/11/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
02/11/2003SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 108-7.
02/05/2003SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/23/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1485-1486)
01/23/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1485)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/23/2003 Referred to
02/05/2003 Markup by
02/11/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-7
House Resources03/05/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands03/10/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/04/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported in the Senate on February 11, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Galisteo Basin Archaeological Sites Protection Act - (Sec. 3) Designates specified archaeological sites in New Mexico as the Galisteo Basin Archaeological Protection Sites.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) continue to search for additional Native American and Spanish colonial sites in the Galisteo Basin area; and (2) submit to Congress recommendations for additions to, deletions from, and modifications of the boundaries of such sites.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Secretary to administer archaeological protection sites located on Federal land in accordance with this Act and other applicable laws in a manner that will protect, preserve, and maintain the archaeological resources and provide for research thereon. Requires the Secretary to submit to specified congressional committees a general management plan (the plan) for the identification, research, protection, and public interpretation of the archaeological protection sites located on Federal lands, and those sites located on private and State lands for which the Secretary has entered into discretionary Cooperative Agreements with their owners for the protection, preservation, maintenance, and administration of their archaeological resources and associated lands.

Directs the Secretary to consult with various parties in developing the plan, including: (1) the Governor of New Mexico; and (2) affected Native American pueblos.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes the Secretary to acquire lands and interests within the boundaries of the archaeological protection sites, and access to them, by donation, purchase with donated or appropriated funds, or by exchange. Requires the consent of the owner thereof for such transactions. Limits to donation or exchange the Secretary's acquisition authority for lands or interests owned by the State of New Mexico or a local government, except that State trust land may be acquired only by exchange.

(Sec. 8) Withdraws all Federal lands within the sites, subject to valid existing rights, from: (1) all forms of entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under all laws relating to mineral and geothermal leasing.

(Sec. 9) States that this Act shall not be construed, among other things, to: (1) authorize regulation of privately owned lands within an archaeological protection site; or (2) restrict or limit an Indian tribe from protecting cultural or religious sites on tribal land.

(Sec. 10) Authorizes appropriations.