Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/23/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/28/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/28/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/30/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 01/30/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/30/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/12/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/05/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/05/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/06/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/10/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/19/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/27/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/27/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/09/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/05/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/09/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/19/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/19/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/20/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/04/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/24/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/09/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/09/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/23/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/24/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/29/2003