Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/02/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/02/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/02/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/03/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/03/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/03/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/04/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/08/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/08/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/09/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/22/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/22/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/23/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/23/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/24/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/24/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/24/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/25/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/07/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/19/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/13/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/09/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/09/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/09/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/14/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/14/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/14/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/17/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/07/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/07/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/13/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/19/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/19/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/20/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/21/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 10/07/2004