Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/08/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/08/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/08/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/09/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/09/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/10/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/30/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/01/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/01/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/17/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/02/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/21/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/08/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/08/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/08/2004