Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/08/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/22/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/20/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/17/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/21/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/12/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/07/2004