Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/10/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/10/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/10/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/10/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/11/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/11/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/11/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/11/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/12/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/22/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/24/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/25/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/25/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/25/2004