Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/10/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-453.
12/10/2004 Signed by President.
11/29/2004 Presented to President.
11/20/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10219)
06/25/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7520-7522; text as passed Senate: CR S7522)
04/29/2004 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
03/10/2004 Introduced in Senate