Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/10/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/11/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/11/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/23/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/23/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/23/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/24/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/24/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/24/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/25/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/25/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/25/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 03/29/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/29/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/29/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/30/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/31/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/05/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/05/2004