There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

TANF Extension Programs bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Welfare Reform Extension Act of 2004

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Welfare Reform Extension Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families block grant program through June 30, 2004, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
03/31/2004Became Public Law No: 108-210. (TXT | PDF)
03/31/2004Signed by President.
03/31/2004Presented to President.
03/30/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1683-1684)
03/25/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3120-3121; text as passed Senate: CR S3121)
03/25/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/31/2004Became Public Law No: 108-210. (TXT | PDF)
03/31/2004Signed by President.
03/31/2004SenatePresented to President.
03/30/2004-1:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/30/2004-1:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1683-1684)
03/30/2004-1:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2231.
03/30/2004-1:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1683-1686)
03/30/2004-1:24pmHouseMr. Herger moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/29/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/25/2004HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
03/25/2004HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
03/25/2004HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/25/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/25/2004-10:45amHouseReceived in the House.
03/25/2004SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3120-3121; text as passed Senate: CR S3121)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/25/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means03/25/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/25/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/29/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2231.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-210 (03/31/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Welfare Reform Extension Act of 2004 - Amends title IV of the Social Security Act (SSA) to extend through June 30, 2004: (1) the TANF block grant program under part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF), including the sexual activity abstinence education program and eligibility for Medicaid under SSA title XIX; (2) the National Random Sample Study of Child Welfare under part B (Child and Family Services); and (3) demonstration projects likely to promote the objectives of part B or part E (Foster Care and Adoption Assistance). Makes appropriations for such purposes. Authorizes grants and payments pursuant to such authority through the third quarter of FY 2004 at the level provided for such activities through the third quarter of FY 2002.