Text: S.2241 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-211 (03/31/2004)

 
[108th Congress Public Law 211]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ211.108]

[[Page 118 STAT. 566]]

Public Law 108-211
108th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To reauthorize certain school lunch and child nutrition programs through 
          June 30, 2004. <<NOTE: Mar. 31, 2004 -  [S. 2241]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. EXCLUSION OF CERTAIN MILITARY HOUSING ALLOWANCES.

    Section 9(b)(7) of the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act 
(42 U.S.C. 1758(b)(7)) is amended by striking ``March 31, 2004'' and 
inserting ``June 30, 2004''.

SEC. 2. CHILD AND ADULT CARE FOOD PROGRAM.

    Section 17(a)(2)(B)(i) of the Richard B. Russell National School 
Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1766(a)(2)(B)(i)) is amended by striking ``March 
31, 2004'' and inserting ``June 30, 2004''.
SEC. 3. REIMBURSEMENT TO STATES UNDER COMMODITY DISTRIBUTION 
                    PROGRAMS.

    Section 15(e) of the Commodity Distribution Reform Act and WIC 
Amendments of 1987 (7 U.S.C. 612c note; Public Law 100-237) is amended 
by striking ``April 1, 2004'' and inserting ``July 1, 2004''.
SEC. 4. FUNDING MAINTENANCE OF COMMODITY DISTRIBUTION PROGRAMS.

    Section 14(a) of the Richard B. Russell National School Lunch Act 
(42 U.S.C. 1762a(a)) is amended by striking ``March 31, 2004'' and 
inserting ``June 30, 2004''.

SEC. 5. SUMMER FOOD SERVICE PROGRAM FOR CHILDREN.

    (a) In General.--Section 13(q) of the Richard B. Russell National 
School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1761(q)) is amended by striking ``March 31, 
2004'' and inserting ``June 30, 2004''.

[[Page 118 STAT. 567]]

    (b) Pilot Projects.--Section 18(f)(2) of the Richard B. Russell 
National School Lunch Act (42 U.S.C. 1769(f)(2)) is amended by striking 
``March 31, 2004'' and inserting ``June 30, 2004''.

    Approved March 31, 2004.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2241:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 150 (2004):
            Mar. 26, considered and passed Senate.
            Mar. 30, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>

Share This Section