Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/29/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/10/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/10/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/11/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/11/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/13/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/17/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/14/2004