Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/29/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/29/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/29/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/17/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/15/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/21/2004