Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/07/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/05/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/22/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/08/2004