Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/06/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/07/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/21/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/21/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/10/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/20/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/16/2004