Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/08/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/20/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/20/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/22/2004